DURHAM KAYAK CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the advancement of the sport of Kayaking, for people of all ages but primarily children. both recreational and competative paddling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 28 February 2003: Standard registration
- 05 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 05 January 2021: Funds transferred to 1190431 DURHAM PADDLESPORT CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81k | £2.80k | £5.24k | £4.84k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £825 | £3.07k | £4.79k | £5.21k | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 November 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 24 April 2019 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CANOEING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN THE DURHAM AREA, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THOSE WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT.
Area of benefit
DURHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window