SPRINGBOARD FAMILY PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One to one support, Groups for parents, Groups for children, Information and advocacy, Outreach and telephone support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 May 2003: Standard registration
- 29 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.24k | £143.69k | £109.69k | £120.38k | £50.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.47k | £125.74k | £118.88k | £120.18k | £59.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 25 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN, PARENTS AND CARERS THROUGH EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window