Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT NORTHUMBRIA
Charity number: 1094495
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 05 February 2009 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 12 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 02 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 25 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 04 October 2004 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window