THE MARLBOROUGH SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable trust is established to advance the education of the public by providing or assisting in the provision of special benefits for the students at Marlborough School, as well as otherwise furthering the education of pupils or former pupils of that school or other persons living within the schools catchment area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bexley
Governance
- 23 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Lee | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Candice Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Coulstock | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.17k | £2.04k | £8.88k | £4.09k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.67k | £50.75k | £2.40k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 23 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT MARLBOROUGH SCHOOL ("THE SCHOOL") BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF ANY SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 2. TO OTHERWISE PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OR FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHETHER BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR OTHER ASSISTANCE CALCULATED TO PROMOTE OR FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS; AND 3. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC LIVING WITHIN THE AREA FROM TIME TO TIME SERVED BY THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARLBOROUGH PARK AVENUE
SIDCUP
KENT
DA15 9DL
- Phone:
- 02083006896
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window