Accounts and annual returns CUMPAS LIMITED

Charity number: 1106508
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 25 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 30 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required