Financial history KINGSGATE COMMUNITY CHURCH (GREAT YARMOUTH)

Charity number: 1096694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £327.02k £255.61k £300.64k £287.74k £344.75k
Total expenditure £316.69k £238.98k £267.96k £309.71k £364.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.75k £75.96k £4.00k N/A N/A