Trustees KINGSGATE COMMUNITY CHURCH (GREAT YARMOUTH)
Charity Number: 1096694

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tafadzwa Kativu | Chair | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hodsden | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucky Chikezie Nwoke | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Kelsey | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Rust | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Kitto-Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Paul Cox | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.