Financial history UGANDA CHILDBIRTH INJURY FUND

Charity Number: 1099135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/09/2020 03/09/2021 03/09/2022 03/09/2023 03/09/2024
Total gross income £70.01k £63.17k £86.39k £90.49k £82.74k
Total expenditure £62.37k £65.87k £77.30k £77.24k £91.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A