SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT IYENGAR YOGA ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SADIYA was set up to support Iyengar yoga in Sheffield and surrounding districts. It provides a focus for Iyengar Yoga practitioners in the area, promoting the benefits and therapeutic aspects of yoga and providing trained and qualified Iyengar Yoga teachers. SADIYA organises yoga days, supports the Sheffield Yoga Centre and maintains links with other Iyengar Yoga institutes and associations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 December 2002: Standard registration
- 05 December 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £3.64k | £2.30k | £2.81k | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.68k | £3.08k | £2.56k | £2.71k | £2.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 20 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 28 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CLASSICAL TEACHINGS OF YOGA BASED UPON THE PRINCIPLES OF THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF PERSONAL CONDUCT AND SERVICE TO OTHERS. (II) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE THERAPEUTIC EFFECTS OF YOGA AS A MEANS OF IMPROVING THE MENTAL PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window