Accounts and annual returns LIVING WATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (WELL)

Charity number: 1099329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required