INTERNATIONAL CHILDREN'S CARE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
International Children's Care UK (ICC UK) has been established in order 'to relieve the hardship and distress of children anywhere in the world, particularly as a result of being orphaned or otherwise without parental support, by providing childrenÔÇÖs care facilities and programs including orphanages anywhere in the world, and establishing adoption programs and services, as appropriate.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Dominican Republic
- El Salvador
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- India
- Mexico
- Nicaragua
- Romania
Governance
- 28 August 2003: Standard registration
- ICC (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GLEN FLECK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LESLENE PEAT-BROWN | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wilmoth Bullock | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shorai Dzirambe | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ERROL BLACKBURN | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KENT DUANE GREVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.32k | £35.32k | £25.10k | £37.06k | £18.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.18k | £42.27k | £20.36k | £28.04k | £15.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY AS A RESULT OF BEING ORPHANED OR OTHERWISE WITHOUT PARENTAL SUPPORT, BY PROVIDING CHILDREN'S CARE FACILITIES AND PROGRAMS INCLUDING ORPHANAGES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, AND ESTABLISHING ADOPTION PROGRAMS AND SERVICES, AS APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 4243
Bracknell
RG42 9QQ
- Phone:
- 03030402885
- Email:
- info@iccuk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window