Financial history FULL GOSPEL REVIVAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1099321
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £86.61k £87.31k £75.11k £135.20k £62.97k
Total expenditure £73.66k £74.89k £57.18k £107.82k £51.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £67.32k N/A