FULL GOSPEL REVIVAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current activities are as follows: Reglious organisation: Youth Service, Women's Department, Men's Department, Sunday School, Choir department, Supplementary School, After School Club, Holiday Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 September 2003: Standard registration
- F.G.R.C (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND SAMUEL EZEKIEL THOMAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH RONALD JEFFERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVEREND HOWARD EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONICA MABELINE PEDDIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.61k | £87.31k | £75.11k | £135.20k | £62.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.66k | £74.89k | £57.18k | £107.82k | £51.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £67.32k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 6TH JUNE 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 22ND AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
THE CHARITIES OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN AND SECULAR EDUCATION IN NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO BENEFIT THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THE SAID NOTTINGHAM REGARDLESS OF RACE, CREED, COLOUR, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, RELIGION AND DISABILITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES TO ALL AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THING FIT.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MUSKHAM STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 2HB
- Phone:
- 01159520201
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window