Friends of Hatton Academy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold discos, raffles, Quizes etc to raise funds for extra activities/resources for Sir Christopher Hatton Academy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 08 December 2006: Standard registration
- SIR CHRISTOPHER HATTON HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelvin Gross | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patience Eva Tetteh | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denisha Bhojani | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justine Woodbridge | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Blackwell | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Richard Gaitskell | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £2.08k | £0 | £1.11k | £2.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £4.03k | £100 | £83 | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 October 2024 | 459 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 1995 as amended on 02 Mar 2023 as amended on 02 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIR CHRISTOPHER HATTON ACADEMY
THE PYGHTLE
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN8 4RP
- Phone:
- 01933226077
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window