THE HUDDERSFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance of choral music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 24 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Sargent | Chair | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Cole | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Sally Ruth Robertshaw | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ford | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Margaret Haliday | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hornby | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Drury | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Sarah Wickham | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Burton | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wright | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Michael Brook | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
LUCY POPLE | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR HELEN RUTH MARTIN | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIR JOHN ANDREW HARMAN | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE TURNBULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MARK ANDREW TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY BARBARA MCLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £366.13k | £241.93k | £92.48k | £330.80k | £196.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.27k | £229.01k | £98.89k | £209.15k | £216.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 29 June 2020 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | 29 June 2020 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 8 OCTOBER 2003 as amended on 03 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CHORAL MUSIC AND, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THAT OBJECTIVE, TO FORM AND MAINTAIN A CHOIR, A YOUTH CHOIR AND A YOUNG VOICES' CHOIR AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORKS AND TO GIVE CONCERTS IN HUDDERSFIELD AND AT SUCH OTHER PLACE OR PLACES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND ELSEWHERE AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE COMMITTEE OF THE SOCIETY FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
HUDDERSFIELD, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Revenue Chambers
St Peters Street
Huddersfield
HD1 1DL
- Phone:
- 07786334182
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window