BRIGHOUSE THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 1096228
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006

Total income: £6,045
Total expenditure: £6,670

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2003: Standard registration
  • 02 November 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 02 November 2007: Funds transferred to 1012902 BRIGHOUSE THEATRE PRODUCTIONS
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • B. T. G (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006
Total gross income £9.01k £6.05k £6.05k
Total expenditure £6.76k £6.67k £6.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 15 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 23 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 26 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required