CROWBOROUGH TENNIS AND SQUASH CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tennis, Squash, Racketball, Dance Classes. Available to all through either membership subscription or pay as you go.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR SANDY YOUNG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Pain | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Davis | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Messenger | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Snabel | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW COLLARD SIMMONS | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FEARNLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL EDWARD MILLMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.03k | £133.41k | £158.82k | £175.33k | £223.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.80k | £111.68k | £148.85k | £152.35k | £194.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £70.70k | £17.12k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF TENNIS, SQUASH, RACKETBALL, TABLE TENNIS AND RELATED SPORTS WHICH ARE CONSIDERED CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAW
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crowborough Tennis and Squash Club
Church Road
Crowborough
East Sussex
United Kingdom
TN6 1BN
- Phone:
- 01892652618
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window