Trustees CROWBOROUGH TENNIS AND SQUASH CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1097049

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR SANDY YOUNG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Pain | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Davis | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Messenger | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Snabel | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW COLLARD SIMMONS | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FEARNLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL EDWARD MILLMAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.