Accounts and annual returns THE SIMON FLETCHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1094808
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 01 November 2019 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 August 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 24 August 2018 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required