Financial history THE SIMON FLETCHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1094808
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £5.07k £4.40k £2.48k £769 £425
Total expenditure £6.75k £8.99k £4.24k £4.00k £2.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A