Epione Wellbeing Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects for which the Greek Cypriot Women's Organisation is established are: -To promote the health and advance the education of mainly Greek Cypriot women -To provide a worker to co-ordinate the project -To provide an outreach worker to reach isolated women and facilitate their participation in the project -To reach as many women of various ages and at different stages of health needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Haringey
Governance
- 05 June 2003: Standard registration
- GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN'S ORGANISATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theodosia Stylianou | Chair | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Panayiota Georgiou | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ASPASIA KYPRIANOU | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.23k | £27.15k | £29.11k | £34.21k | £54.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.65k | £63.94k | £45.61k | £31.21k | £22.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2022 | 509 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 May 2021 | 206 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION'S DATED 13 JUNE 2002 AND 29 APRIL 2003 as amended on 27 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DENMARK ROAD LONDON N8 0DZ
Contact information
- Address:
-
1160 HIGH ROAD
LONDON
N20 0RA
- Phone:
- 07794055230
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window