PROFESSIONAL GARDENERS' TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives grants to assist gardeners gain necessary qualifications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 December 2003: Standard registration
- PROFESSIONAL GARDERNERS TRUST (Previous name)
- PROFESSIONAL GARDERNERS TRUST (Previous name)
- THE PROFESSIONAL GARDENERS' GUILD TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hugh Garth Anderton | Chair | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Oostenbrink | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jon Wardle | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bertie Mycroft Swainston | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Goodfellow | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Sturges | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Seal | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Hudson | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.92k | £49.90k | £68.44k | £44.84k | £68.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.56k | £36.42k | £35.62k | £46.71k | £60.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR OTHER MONETARY AWARDS TO PERSONS ENGAGED IN HORTICULTURE, IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF THEIR FAMILY'S ECONOMIC OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Inn Farm
Forest Coal Pit
ABERGAVENNY
Gwent
NP7 7LT
- Phone:
- 07747130484
- Email:
- info@pgtrust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window