LYTCHETT MATRAVERS PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1095455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a Pre-school that offers sessional and full day care for children aged from 2 until Primary school age. We also offer a breakfast club and an after school club.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £336,579
Total expenditure: £324,714

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Glew Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Rachel Pettit Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Anna Pettit Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Gemma White Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £347.32k £312.78k £300.87k £335.91k £336.58k
Total expenditure £350.17k £302.74k £252.64k £290.46k £324.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £208.79k N/A £167.92k £167.68k £196.92k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LYTCHETT PRE SCHOOL
91 WAREHAM ROAD
LYTCHETT MATRAVERS
POOLE
BH16 6DY
Phone:
01202 623915