SOCIAL CARE IN ACTION

Charity number: 1096903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Health and Social Care

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Hampshire
  • Portsmouth City
  • Southampton City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 2003: Standard registration
  • 15 May 2025: Funds received from 1108220 THE STEVEN JAMES PRACTICE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE QUINN CENTRE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Hickman Chair 28 May 2015
OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST
Received: On time
FLAT SPACES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rebecca Dries Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Nicola Ward Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Beth Aarons Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Nick Kohn Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Tonkin Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
David Martin Ball Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Dominic Lodge Trustee 30 October 2013
OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.80m £8.23m £4.54m £4.92m £5.40m
Total expenditure £12.34m £4.76m £5.05m £5.40m £6.14m
Income from government contracts £9.73m £2.89m £3.67m £4.29m £4.48m
Income from government grants £96.41k £649.99k £166.13k N/A £6.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £186.30k £1.20k £248.69k £504 £104.18k
Income - Other trading activities £4.02m £404.23k £6.93k £64.85k £74.24k
Income - Charitable activities £7.36m £3.95m £4.16m £4.80m £5.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £232.73k £110.16k £109.11k £54.99k £54.48k
Income - Other £0 £3.77m £12.75k £1.76k £583
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.02m £4.49m £5.05m £5.36m £6.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.48k £4.27k £5.10k £5.20k £0
Expenditure - Governance £51.69k £41.44k £31.90k £33.62k £28.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £30.68k £52.14k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.25m £269.50k £3.39k £39.21k £44.36k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Own use assets £1.53m £800.64k £2.21m £2.29m £1.96m
Long-term investments £190.00k £190.00k £190.00k £190.00k £190.00k
Other assets £1.61m £4.03m £2.13m £1.46m £1.08m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.37m £518.86k £549.22k £522.95k £545.17k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 13 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 08 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Paynes Road
Southampton
SO15 3DL
Phone:
02380366663