PARK EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Christian worship services; prayer meetings; bible studies; Sunday school; mums and toddlers group; services in local homes for the elderly; fellowship lunches; evangelism; missionary support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 09 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Charters | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chukwudozie Akuwudike | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayley Shum | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Kemp | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Joanne Perkins | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DERRETT JAMES WATTS | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rachel Grace McNabb | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Allan Webster | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ruth Watts | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joesph Woodward | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger William John Kirkham | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Charles Woodward | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH GALLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.43k | £107.73k | £123.75k | £181.30k | £240.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.67k | £129.89k | £160.43k | £165.94k | £157.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £60 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT SPECIFIED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boughey Road
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 2BZ
- Phone:
- 01782 658100
- Email:
- secretary@park-church.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window