NORWICH INTERNATIONAL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norwich International Youth Project works with young people in Norfolk who are seeking asylum, have refugee status or are otherwise displaced from their country of origin. NIYP supports young people with their wellbeing, their education and their integration into life in the UK through a weekly drop in youth group, a weekly English class, individual support, and trips and residentials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 August 2003: Standard registration
- NIYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE SKIPPER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachael Martis | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martha Ball | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gerlinde Diehl | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE HAMMOND | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.80k | £50.00k | £57.34k | £43.27k | £76.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.73k | £33.81k | £41.91k | £52.22k | £59.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 3 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PEOPLE WHO DO NOT HOLD EU NATIONALITY, INCLUDING STATELESS PERSONS, RECOGNISED REFUGEES UNDER THE 1951 UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION, THOSE SEEKING RECOGNITION UNDER THE AFORESAID CONVENTION AND THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN GRANTED CONDITIONAL LEAVE TO REMAIN IN OR ENTER THE UK. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PEOPLE WHO DO NOT HOLD EU NATIONALITY, INCLUDING STATELESS PERSONS, RECOGNISED REFUGEES UNDER THE 1951 UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION, THOSE SEEKING RECOGNITION UNDER THE AFORESAID CONVENTION AND THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN GRANTED CONDITIONAL LEAVE TO REMAIN IN OR ENTER THE UK. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORWICH AND ALL OTHER NORFOLK DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Pottergate
NORWICH
NR2 1DX
- Phone:
- 07415734896
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window