Accounts and annual returns NEW FUTURES NEPAL

Charity number: 1098661
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 25 May 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 03 July 2011 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 05 July 2011 35 days late
Annual return 31 July 2009 15 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 15 February 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 27 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 27 May 2009 On Time