Financial history NEW FUTURES NEPAL

Charity number: 1098661
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £53.55k £89.52k £131.44k £72.17k £107.58k
Total expenditure £43.20k £52.59k £88.44k £94.36k £134.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A