LOWER SHAW FARM CHILDREN'S PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Project runs activities and events that encourage children to use and learn about the natural resources around them whilst promoting an environmental awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 22 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Leah Povey | Chair | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Gilvin | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE WILMOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £163 | £0 | £730 | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £60 | £0 | £1.38k | £120 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 12 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAY, RECREATION AND LEARNING. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SWINDON BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWER SHAW FARM
OLD SHAW LANE
SHAW
SWINDON
SN5 5PJ
- Phone:
- 01793771080
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window