MARESFIELD CONSERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1104136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To conserve the village character of Maresfield and its surrounding area. To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment in Maresfield. To liaise with interested organisations including the County, District and Parish Council

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,347
Total expenditure: £4,847

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNE ELIZABETH LAWRANCE Chair 28 July 2021
None on record
Richard Allan Wane Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Thomas Henry Merchant Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Tracie Coe Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
CAROLINE ANNE SHAW Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Terence Christopher Brady Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
BRUCE ALAN MILTON Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
IAN SHAW Trustee 07 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.25k £4.22k £5.46k £5.25k £5.35k
Total expenditure £8.92k £3.58k £4.58k £4.24k £4.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 May 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Redwood House
Middle Drive
Maresfield Park,Maresfield
UCKFIELD
East Sussex
TN22 2HG
Phone:
07739913975