GOOD NEIGHBOURHOOD TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GOOD NEIGHBOURHOOD TRUST PROVIDES POSITIVE CHANGE BY FREE AND IMPARTIAL ADVICE, GUIDANCE, EDUCATION, APPRENTICESHIP & VOCATIONAL TRAINING TO YOUNG PEOPLE BY WAY OF CONFERENCES, WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS, SYMPOSIUMS AT DESIGNATED CENTRES ACROSS ALL THE BOROUGHS IN LONDON. WE HAVE AS WELL SET UP A WORKPLACE CENTRE AT WOOD GREEN N15 3EN, TO SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE SEEKING EMPLOYMENT IN VARIOUS TRADE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
Governance
- 08 September 2004: Standard registration
- 06 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
A TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY RAISING AWARENESS OF CULTURAL DIVERSITY BY PUBLICATIONS, MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window