THE PEACE ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the reporting period, the Alliance's main objectives were to further its work in all of London 32 boroughs and the City of London and to make a positive contribution to communities and organizations with the various projects. This included workshops, events and support work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 2003: Standard registration
- HARINGEY PEACE ALLIANCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joyce Ohajah | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terry Jervis | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Afolabi Andu | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL KASUMU | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANTHONY ASHAYE | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLIVIA MENSAH | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11 | £8.45k | £890 | £16.90k | £74.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £2.72k | £4.05k | £12.61k | £54.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15TH AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF LIFE AND PROPERTY THROUGH THE REDUCTION OF CRIME AND THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF COMMUNITY SAFETY, CRIME PREVENTION, CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; B) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; C) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; E) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSON WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE SAME AS A RESULT OF ANY CRIMINAL OFFENCE COMMITTED BY ANY PERSONS OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATEVER AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; F) TO ADVANCE THE REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS AND PERSONS AFFECTED BY DRUG, ALCOHOL OR OTHER SUBSTANCE ADDICTION OR ABUSE IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; G) TO RELIVE PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM ALL FORMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PEACE ALLIANCE
THE DREAM CENTRE
TOTTENHAM TOWN HALL
TOWN HALL APPROACH
LONDON
N15 4RY
- Phone:
- 02088089439
- Email:
- info@peacealliance.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.THEPEACEALLIANCE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window