HEVENINGHAM HALL COUNTRY FAIR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A country fair to raise funds for the relief of need and advancement of christian faith in the parishes of Cookley, Cratfield, Heveningham, Huntingfield, Laxfield and Walpole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Fairs | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Carr | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
LOIS HUNT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.99k | £53.73k | £73 | £321.15k | £321.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.36k | £161.48k | £238 | £198.67k | £318.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 10TH MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 APRIL 2009. as amended on 16 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS {"THE OBJECTS") 1. THE RELIEF, IN A CHARITABLE MANNER OF NEED IN THE CRATFIELD, HEVENINGHAM, HUNTINGFIELD, COOKLEY, LAXFIELD AND WALPOLE DISTRICT OF SUFFOLK. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT, IN A CHARITABLE MANNER, OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE CRATFIELD, HEVENINGHAM, HUNTINGFIELD, COOKLEY, LAXFIELD AND WALPOLE DISTRICT OF SUFFOLK. 3. THE PROVISION, IN A CHARITABLE MANNER OF ASSISTANCE TO DESERVING CAUSES IN AN AREA SERVED BY THE TRUST AND THE SUPPORTING PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
CRATFIELD, HEVENINGHAM, HUNTINGFIELD, COOKLEY, LAXFIELD AND WALPOLE DISTRICTS OF SUFFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEVENINGHAM HALL
HEVENINGHAM
HALESWORTH
IP19 0PN
- Phone:
- 01986798151
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window