Eleni

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MISSION STATEMENT Eleni is dedicated to providing meaningful dance experiences to schools, groups and communities throughout North East Wales. Our purpose is to enhance well-being for the individual through dance and movement, nurturing communities, cultures and society as a whole. We don't teach people how to dance, we give them a reason to.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £112,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 11 July 2003: Standard registration
- NEW DANCE (Previous name)
- NORTH EAST WALES DANCE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Carey | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Whitfield | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Armstrong | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jeanette Lillian Smith | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bithell | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Christine Dukes | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gwenno Eleri Jones | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.10k | £132.04k | £109.80k | £130.58k | £131.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.54k | £136.15k | £132.14k | £119.11k | £119.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.12k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.90k | N/A | £112.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/08/2013 as amended on 13 Dec 2019 as amended on 01 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ART, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF DANCE WITHIN NORTH EAST WALES
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Irish Square
Upper Denbigh Road
St Asaph
LL17 0RN
- Phone:
- 01978869456
- Email:
- info@eleni.cymru
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window