AL-HAMD-O-LILLAH (FOUNDATION) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides medical facilities and medications for the poor in Pakistan. Also provides humanitarian assistance where required in the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 16 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHSIN MUNIF | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Mohammed Haroon Zafarullah Khan | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Syed Ehsan Ali | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MUNIF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.20k | £89.42k | £82.88k | £81.84k | £77.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.88k | £12.03k | £152.74k | £12.90k | £7.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
IN PAKISTAN AND SUCH OTHER AREAS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE 1) TO PROVIDE MEDICAL ASSISTANCE TO THE POOR AND NEEDY IN AREAS OF THE WORLD THAT THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE 2) TO PROVIDE BASIC EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TO THE POOR AND NEEDY IN AREAS OF THE WORLD THAT THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN AND SUCH OTHER AREAS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
410 DIDSBURY ROAD
STOCKPORT
SK4 3BY
- Phone:
- 01614326411
- Email:
- mohsin.munif@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window