POPPLETON ANGLICAN CHURCHES AND SUNDAY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making trust to support the advancement of education in the Christian Faith within Poppleton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
Governance
- 18 December 2002: Standard registration
- DODSWORTH HALL (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Salmon | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donald Inglis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ANN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
LINDA AILSA JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.72k | £3.71k | £3.72k | £4.26k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £964 | £553 | £494 | £375 | £20.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NETHER AND UPPER POPPLETON, NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 DIKELANDS CLOSE
UPPER POPPLETON
YORK
YO26 6HY
- Phone:
- 01904787973
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window