CHALKWELL HALL INFANT JUNIOR PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-raising activities in school e.g. Christmas Bazaar, Bouncy Castle fun day, Summer fun day, quiz night, curry evenings, raffles, Bags2School, Adventure Island (fun fair) tickets, disco, West end shows and local productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 04 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Josephine Jackson | Chair | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kristina Campbell-Carr | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Robyn Evans | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Moule | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.53k | £47.50k | £29.79k | £83.42k | £70.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.56k | £71.79k | £52.22k | £32.52k | £15.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CHALKWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalkwell Hall Infants School
London Road
LEIGH-ON-SEA
Essex
SS9 3NL
- Phone:
- 01702 478533
- Email:
- ptachalkwellhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window