SELF-REALIZATION FELLOWSHIP CHURCH-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SRF-UK provides and maintains a church building and strives to support the spiritual and religious works of the Self-Realization Fellowship Church in the UK and at its international headquarters in the United States.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- United States
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
- SELF-REALIZATION FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- SELF-REALIZATION FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (SRF-UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Bagley | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Bouchard | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JILL HOERTER | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RONALD EISELE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £715.80k | £623.56k | £175.97k | £173.05k | £291.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £799.15k | £452.00k | £287.93k | £243.67k | £313.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £685.23k | £609.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £30.57k | £14.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £8.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £799.15k | £392.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.97k | £59.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £252.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £59.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 APRIL 2003 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION THROUGH THE PROMOTION BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS OF THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE SELF-REALISATION FELLOWSHIP CHURCH CONTAINED IN THE AIMS AND IDEALS FORMULATED BY PARAMAHANSA YOGANANDA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KEYSTONE LAW
48-49 CHANCERY LANE
LONDON
WC2A 1JF
- Phone:
- 02033193700
- Email:
- info@srf-london.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window