Financial history FOUNTAINS OF KNOWLEDGE

Charity number: 1096607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £586.58k £635.18k £682.20k £806.78k £958.96k
Total expenditure £387.52k £444.86k £580.24k £711.58k £907.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £96.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £138.53k £101.61k £227.18k £231.89k £219.50k
Income - Other trading activities £9.45k £15.75k £0 £0 £6.70k
Income - Charitable activities £433.36k £421.36k £414.14k £563.67k £732.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £492 £117 £11 £11.20k £0
Income - Other £4.75k £96.35k £40.87k £15 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £387.52k £444.86k £563.47k £711.58k £907.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £16.77k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £540 £1.54k £0 £1.23k £1.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0