THE KEMSING HERITAGE CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPLY AND RESEARCH OF INFORMATION CONCERNING THE PARISH OF KEMSING AND MAKING THIS MATERIAL AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 04 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERICA ANNE LOVENNA RANSLEY COLE MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirsten Schlyder | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Geer | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Michael Gillett | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doug Parry | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ROBARTS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET RUTH EATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JANE BOWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN O'SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES COPLESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN VICTOR WATERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Andrew Rees Williams | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £1.14k | £2.17k | £2.27k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £2.61k | £2.41k | £2.88k | £2.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2002, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 21ST FEBRUARY 2004,
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE OF THE HERITAGE OF KEMSING AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR, ALSO OF HERITAGE GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
KEMSING
Contact information
- Address:
-
RED COURT
WOODLAND RISE
SEAL
SEVENOAKS
TN15 0JB
- Phone:
- 01732764068
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window