PAWZ FOR THOUGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
rescue rehabilitation and rehoming of animals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
115 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Joan Harvey | Chair |
|
||||||
VIVIEN ELIZABETH JOHNSON | Trustee | 12 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA CARTER | Trustee | 12 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL ADAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS M L EBDALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.88k | £135.75k | £107.94k | £232.87k | £343.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.58k | £85.17k | £101.55k | £139.08k | £188.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £4.76k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TYNE AND WEAR, DURHAM AND NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOWBRIDGE HOUSE
FERRYBOAT LANE
NORTH HYLTON
SUNDERLAND
SR5 3HW
- Phone:
- 07718771591
- Email:
- lebdale@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window