Accounts and annual returns ANOINTED INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1095129
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 November 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 November 2024 383 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 November 2024 748 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2021 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required