Financial history THE KIBWORTH BEAUCHAMP RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND

Charity number: 1096210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.99k £4.14k £4.28k £4.30k £4.37k
Total expenditure £2.00k £3.00k £5.06k £5.47k £8.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A