BODY OF CHRIST CHURCH BOCC - EGLISE CORPS DU CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Body of Christ Church BOCC runs a drop-in center where Angolan Portuguese-speaking with various forms of disabilities with their families who are our members and homeless people in Cardiff can come and gain access to services, make friends and share their concerns. We provide legal and general advice, information and advocacy on a wide range of issues including energy, water, food distribution etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 13 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bote Botengs Chair | Chair | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francois Bonkoto Secretary | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BME Cardiff Place Advisor | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BME Cardiff Place Treasurer | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malamu Eleka Advisor | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.15k | £14.82k | £15.00k | £14.90k | £15.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.05k | £14.67k | £14.87k | £14.85k | £14.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £5.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AFRICAN FRENCH-SPEAKING PEOPLE AND TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF THOSE BENEFICIARIES THEY WISH TO AID BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO MEET ANY EMPLOYMENT NEEDS AS WELL AS THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO MEET ANY EMPLOYMENT NEEDS AS WELL AS THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON HEALTH, HOUSING, IMMIGRATION, INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING AND ADVOCACY ISSUES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICA AND THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HACKNEY AND HARINGEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Millennium Court
Broadway
CARDIFF
CF24 1NB
- Phone:
- 07963535364
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window