HIGHER EDUCATION POLICY INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to ensure as far as possible that higher education policy development in the UK is informed by research and by knowledge of the experience of others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£799,493
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £791.54k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £7.96k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£731,008
Raising funds | £5.29k | |
Charitable activities | £725.72k | |
Other | £0 |
£60,422 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £133 from 1 government contract(s) and £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £725.72k | |
Retained for future use | £68.49k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £725.72k | |
Retained for future use | £128.91k |
People

6 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 September 2003: Standard registration
- HEPI (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Dame Julia Goodfellow | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sally Mapstone | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Curnock Cook OBE | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAME HELEN SARAH WALLACE | Trustee | 28 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Sir David Robert Bell | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £464.88k | £554.32k | £542.67k | £785.97k | £799.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £572.56k | £428.98k | £470.30k | £636.97k | £731.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £133 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £511.16k | £541.47k | £782.39k | £791.54k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £43.17k | £1.19k | £3.58k | £7.96k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £424.96k | £465.35k | £631.56k | £725.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £3.97k | £4.79k | £5.41k | £5.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £4.79k | £7.37k | £6.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £3.97k | £0 | £5.41k | £5.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £50 | £159 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £12.08k | £13.63k | £12.39k | £8.24k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £466.21k | £579.43k | £634.56k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £804.25k | £498.87k | £446.98k | £663.21k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £138.03k | £349.49k | £267.00k | £405.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 AUGUST 2003 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO AND UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF HIGHER EDUCATION AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF POLICY MAKERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM PROVIDED THAT THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE INSTITUTE SHALL NOT BE APPLIED DIRECTLY IN THE RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS, BUT MAY BE APPLIED IN SUPPLEMENTARY RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CUMBERLAND COURT
80 MOUNT STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 6HH
- Phone:
- 01865 284450
- Email:
- admin@hepi.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window