Financial history VETERANS AID

Charity number: 1095308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.85m £1.92m £1.61m £1.92m £2.32m
Total expenditure £1.89m £1.81m £1.87m £1.99m £2.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £130.38k £65.94k £60.94k £68.96k £84.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £545.63k £823.98k £620.46k £671.61k £646.08k
Income - Other trading activities £9.16k £5.18k £9.52k £11.31k £15.50k
Income - Charitable activities £1.27m £968.74k £956.51k £1.21m £1.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.51k £23.69k £27.57k £28.00k £27.38k
Income - Other £0 £101.59k £0 £0 £81.80k
Income - Legacies £6.50k £3.75k £100.00k £121.41k £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.66m £1.72m £1.84m £1.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £138.19k £150.45k £153.41k £153.28k £139.88k
Expenditure - Governance £47.76k £51.32k £52.73k £55.72k £57.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.45k £5.33k £5.33k £10.56k £12.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 £119 £0 £0 £33.48k