Financial history SUPPORTIVE SRC LTD

Charity Number: 1095388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.45m £3.54m £4.29m £4.02m £4.78m
Total expenditure £3.38m £3.33m £3.98m £4.02m £4.84m
Income from government contracts £3.24m £3.15m £4.28m £4.01m £4.78m
Income from government grants £53.21k £378.90k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £8.83k £6.59k £6.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.43m £3.53m £4.28m £4.01m £4.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £293 £276 £79 £427 £1.48k
Income - Other £13.29k £4.54k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.38m £3.32m £3.97m £4.01m £4.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.52k £1.69k £9.00k £3.98k £2.66k
Expenditure - Governance £5.32k £5.76k £21.48k £56.83k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £34.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0