WORSLEY MESNES SOUTH COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation for children, young people, senior citizens resident in Wigan. They also have music and dance classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wigan
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
- W.M.S.C.A.G. (Working name)
- WORSLEY MESNES SOUTH COMMUNITY GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP KELLY | Chair | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGIE PRESCOTT | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HURST | Trustee | 10 October 2001 |
|
|
||||
MISS A PRESCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BILLY ROTHERHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.12k | £36.98k | £20.16k | £38.59k | £24.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.51k | £16.43k | £29.93k | £38.13k | £20.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.89k | £20.67k | £10.94k | £13.49k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WORSLEY MESNES SOUTH AND GOOSE GREEN AREAS OF WIGAN METROPOLITAN BOROUGH (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE. (III) TO CARRY OUT OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE WORSLEY MESNES SOUTH COMMUNITY.TH GRANTS OR LOANS IN CASH OR IN KIND OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORSLEY MESNES SOUTH AND GOOSE GREEN AREAS OF WIGAN METROPOLITAN BOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clifton Street Community Centre
Clifton Street
Worsley Mesnes
Wigan
WN3 5HN
- Phone:
- 01942244641
- Email:
- cliftonstreetcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window