E.D.S.A EVERTON DISABLED SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote disability rights especially with regards football stadia access
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinny Keating | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Williams | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Wilson | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean McGeever | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £895 | £265 | £1.33k | £648 | £635 | |
|
Total expenditure | £726 | £317 | £300 | £250 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 April 2025 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 August 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 June 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROMOTING IMPROVED ACCESS AND IMPROVED FACILITIES FOR THEM AS FOOTBALL SPECTATORS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Sandon Street
Waterloo
Liverpool
L22 5NW
- Phone:
- 01512869666
- Email:
- PATROONEY1878@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window