THE WEST BROMWICH CENTRAL (A) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity Number: 1095761
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2004

Total income: £4,993
Total expenditure: £4,033

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Sandwell

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2003: Standard registration
  • 12 March 2010: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2004
Total gross income £4.99k
Total expenditure £4.03k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2004 26 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required